GA SB211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 2 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to advertisement and sale of meat generally, so as to render unlawful the representation of nonanimal products and non-slaughtered animal flesh as meat; to provide a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advertisement and Sale of Meat; representation of nonanimal products and non-slaughtered animal flesh as meat; render unlawful

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #731 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #758 (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #135 (Y: 48 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-31 Effective Date
2020-07-24 Act 486
2020-07-24SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-25SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2020-06-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2019-03-07SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-27SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-27SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback