GA SB210 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 15 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide for recess for students in kindergarten and grades one through five; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Quality Basic Education Act"; recess for students in kindergarten and grades one through five; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] |
Sen. Valencia Seay [D] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |