GA SB210 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-12 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-12 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to conservation and natural resources, so as to repeal Chapter 6A, relating to land conservation; to create the Georgia Legacy Program; to provide for legislative intent; to create conservation funding mechanisms and provide for their operation; to establish procedural requirements; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Legacy Program; create; conservation funding mechanisms; operation
Sponsors
Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. John Crosby [R] |
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #139 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |