GA SB210 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-306 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the honors program and residential high school program, so as to include home schooled students among those students eligible to participate in the student honors program; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
High School Program; include home schooled students; eligible to participate in the student honors programs
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. Ralph Hudgens [R] | Sen. Eric Johnson [R] |
Sen. Dan Moody [R] | Sen. Dan Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-25 - House - House Vote #327 - Pass (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #173 - Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #173 - Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-21 | Act 24 | |
2009-04-21 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-25 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Read and Referred |