GA SB21 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Effective Date 2021-04-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Effective Date 2021-04-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Stonecrest in DeKalb County, approved April 21, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3538), as amended, so as to limit the mayor to voting only in the event of a tie of the council; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Stonecrest in DeKalb County; mayor; limit voting only in the event of a tie of the council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #312 (Y: 155 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #211 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #211 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Effective Date 2021-04-01 | |
2021-04-01 | Act 11 | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |