GA SB207 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Board for Physician Workforce, so as to change the name of such board to the Georgia Board of Health Care Workforce; to revise the board's membership; to provide for current members of the board to serve out their terms of office; to amend the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to conform cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Board for Physician Workforce; change name; board's membership; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #329 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #297 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #109 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #297 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #109 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-25 | Act 50 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |