GA SB205 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Perry Area Convention and Visitors Bureau Authority, approved February 27, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 3542), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 1, 1996 (Ga. L. 1996, p. 3831), so as to change requirements for appointment of members of the authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Perry Area Convention and Visitors Bureau Authority; requirements for appointment of members of authority; change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - House - House Vote #262 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #163 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02 Effective Date
2017-05-02 Act 74
2017-05-02SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-06SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-06SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-17SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback