GA SB203 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Veto V11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Veto V11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 4 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to industry services training program, so as to provide for tuition-free programs that relate to the operation of a commercial motor vehicle for veterans; to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to repeal provisions authorizing joinder of motor carriers and their insurance carriers in tort and contract causes of action; to provide for standards of service hours for motor carriers operating solely intrastate; to provide for hiring standards for commercial driver's license holders; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Trucking Opportunity Act of 2023"; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #820 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #185 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #184 (Y: 19 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 17th: Senate Vote #183 (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #182 (Y: 28 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #185 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #184 (Y: 19 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 17th: Senate Vote #183 (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #182 (Y: 28 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Veto V11 | |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-20 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-03-13 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-03-13 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-01-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |