GA SB203 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 23 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Annotated, relating to licensing of agents, agencies, subagents, counselors, and adjusters, so as to provide that certain individuals who collect and input data into an automated claims adjudication system are exempt from licensure; to provide for definitions; to change certain resident independent adjuster license requirements; to add certain nonresident independent adjuster license requirements; to provided for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; provide that certain individuals who collect/input data; automated claims adjudication system are exempt from licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #872 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 152 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #884 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #322 - Passage (Y: 139 N: 23 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #178 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #884 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #322 - Passage (Y: 139 N: 23 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #178 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 727 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-29 | House Insists | |
2012-01-23 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2011-04-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-30 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-22 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-21 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Read and Referred |