GA SB202 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to provide that persons or entities that mail absentee ballot applications shall mail such applications only to eligible registered electors who have not already requested, been issued, or voted an absentee ballot; to require certain comparisons to remove improper names from mail distribution lists; to provide for sanctions for violations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections and Primaries; persons or entities that mail absentee ballot applications shall mail such applications only to eligible registered electors; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #283 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Im Transmit: House Vote #297 (Y: 100 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #296 (Y: 100 N: 75 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #189 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 74, Sb 93, Sb 141, Sb 178, Sb 202, Sb 232, Sb 199, Sb 253: Senate Vote #156 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25 Effective Date
2021-03-25 Act 9
2021-03-25SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2021-03-25SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2021-03-25SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2021-03-25HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2021-03-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-08SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-08SenateSenate Engrossed
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-18SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-17SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59827
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198006
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199384
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200015
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201121
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201170
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201498
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201427
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201429
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201424
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59827#18462
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59827#18495
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59827#18626
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59827#18627
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59827#18655

Bill Comments

feedback