GA SB201 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to labor and industrial relations, so as to allow employees to use sick leave for the care of immediate family members; to provide for definitions; to provide for conditions to take leave; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Labor and Industrial Relations; employees to use sick leave for the care of immediate family members; allow
Sponsors
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #369 (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Vote #298 (Y: 114 N: 51 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #97 (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Vote #298 (Y: 114 N: 51 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #97 (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 203 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House Postponed |
2017-03-16 | House | House Postponed |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |