GA SB2 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public utilities and public transportation, so as to specifically authorize electric membership corporations and their affiliates to provide broadband services; to provide for definitions; to authorize certain financing and partnerships for the provision of broadband services; to prohibit cross-subsidization between the provision of broadband services and an electric membership corporation's natural gas activities or electricity services activities; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities and Public Transportation; electric membership corporations and their affiliates; authorize; broadband services; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #375 (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #402 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #312 (Y: 107 N: 62 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #151 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26 Effective Date
2019-04-26 Act 51
2019-04-26SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-09SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
2019-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-01-15SenateSenate Hopper
2018-12-21SenateSenate Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback