GA SB2 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to competencies and core curriculum in elementary and secondary education, so as to provide that a student who completes certain requirements relating to postsecondary coursework may be awarded a high school diploma; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; student who completes certain requirements relating to postsecondary coursework awarded a high school diploma
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Vote #290 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #14 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Vote #290 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #14 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-04-30 | Act 33 | |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2015-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |