GA SB174 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding bonds and recognizances, so as to authorize appointed judges who are fulfilling a vacancy of an elected judge to issue an unsecured judicial release under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bonds and Recognizances; appointed judges who are fulfilling a vacancy of an elected judge to issue an unsecured judicial release under certain circumstances; authorize
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #444 (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #412 (Y: 99 N: 71 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #83 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #412 (Y: 99 N: 71 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #83 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 216 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |