GA SB17 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general insurance provisions, so as to establish the Special Advisory Commission on Mandated Health Insurance Benefits; to provide for its membership, terms, meetings, and duties; to provide for review of proposed legislation containing a mandated health insurance benefit or provider; to provide for review of existing mandated health insurance benefits or providers; to provide for staff assistance; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; establish the Special Advisory Commission on Mandated Health Insurance Benefits; membership, terms, meetings and duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #378 - Agree To House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Vote #244 - Passage (Y: 96 N: 67 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #42 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Vote #244 - Passage (Y: 96 N: 67 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #42 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 78 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2011-03-30 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-29 | House Postponed | |
2011-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-28 | House First Readers | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Read and Referred |