GA SB165 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the number of superior court judges for each judicial circuit; to amend an Act entitled "An Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the superior courts, so as to provide for additional judges of the Atlanta Judicial Circuit, the Bell-Forsyth Judicial Circuit, the Chattahoochee Judicial Circuit, the Cobb Judicial Circuit, the Tallapoosa Judicial Circuit, and the Towaliga Judicial Circuit," approved March 27, 2000 (Ga. L. 2000, p. 205), so as to change the method of selection of the chief judge of the Chattahoochee Judicial Circuit; to provide for the duties of the chief judge and presiding judge of said circuit; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Superior Courts; provide for additional judge of the Chattahoochee Judicial Circuit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #133 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |