GA SB161 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to drivers' licenses, so as to require horizontal orientations for the form of all drivers' licenses and identification cards issued to applicants who are citizens of the United States; to require vertical orientations for the form of all drivers' licenses and identification cards issued to applicants who are not citizens of the United States; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Drivers' Licenses; form of all drivers' licenses and identification cards issued to applicants who are US citizens; require horizontal orientations
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50501 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/165057 |