GA SB16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 and Code Section 31-2A-18 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the regulation of low THC oil and the establishment of the Low THC Oil Patient Registry, definitions, purpose, registration cards, quarterly reports, and waiver forms, respectively, so as to change the definition of low THC oil; to change provisions relating to conditions eligible for use of low THC oil; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low THC Oil; definition; provisions relating to conditions eligible for use; change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #304 (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #328 (Y: 167 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #60 (Y: 21 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #61 (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 229
2017-05-09SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-17HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-16SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-16SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-11SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/SB/16
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/162816.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164659.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165675.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165674.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165677.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165616.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/168758.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170462.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14830
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14829
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15277
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15435

Bill Comments

feedback