GA SB157 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 20, 26, 31, 33, and 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education, food, drugs, and cosmetics, health, insurance, and professions and businesses, respectively, so as to create a preclearance process in the licensing of individuals with criminal records who make an application to or are investigated by certain licensing boards and commissions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and Businesses; preclearance process in the licensing of individuals with criminal records who make an application to or are investigated by certain licensing boards and commissions; create
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Russ Goodman [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #123 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |