GA SB157 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to waste management, so as to provide that local solid waste management and reporting shall be optional; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waste Management; provide local solid waste management/reporting shall be optional

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #403 - Agree To House Amendment (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House Vote #259 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #168 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-01 Effective Date
2011-05-11 Act 76
2011-05-11 Senate Date Signed by Governor
2011-04-26 Senate Sent to Governor
2011-04-14 Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub
2011-03-31 House Passed/Adopted
2011-03-31 House Third Readers
2011-03-28 House Committee Favorably Reported
2011-03-22 House Second Readers
2011-03-21 House First Readers
2011-03-16 Senate Passed/Adopted
2011-03-16 Senate Third Read
2011-03-14 Senate Read Second Time
2011-03-11 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2011-02-28 Senate Read and Referred

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback