GA SB156 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to insurance, so as to provide for the division of a domestic insurer into two or more resulting domestic insurers; to provide for definitions; to provide for a plan of division subject to approval by the Insurance Commissioner; to amend Part 1 of Article 13 of Chapter 2 of Title 14 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the right to dissent and obtain payment for shares, so as to add the right to dissent and obtain payment for shares for a division of a domestic insurer; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; division of a domestic insurer into two or more resulting domestic insurers; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #251 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #76 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-18HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-21SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback