GA SB156 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales and use taxes, so as to provide certain restrictions with regard to equalized homestead option sales and use taxes; to provide for limitations on the collection of certain other taxes while such equalized homestead option sales and use tax is being levied; to provide for the sales on which such tax may be levied; to provide limitation on the use of special purpose local option sales taxes which are levied in conjunction with an equalized homestead option sales and use tax; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and Use Taxes; equalized homestead option sales and use taxes; provide certain restrictions
Sponsors
Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #318 (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #358 (Y: 160 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #96 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #100 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #358 (Y: 160 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #96 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #100 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 206 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported As Amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |