GA SB15 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-09 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-09 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to waste management, so as to provide for quarantining and certified clean up of sites where methamphetamine was unlawfully manufactured; to define certain terms; to provide for notices of quarantine and the filing thereof in the offices of clerks of superior courts; to provide for lists of persons authorized to perform testing, clean up, and certify fitness of previously quarantined property; to provide for filing of certificates of fitness in the offices of clerks of superior courts; to provide for lifting of quarantines; to provide for a registry of quarantined properties and the removal of properties from such list; to provide for continued applicability of other provisions of said chapter; to provide for rules and regulations; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Waste Management; provide for quarantining/certified clean up of sites where methamphetamine was unlawfully manufactured
Sponsors
Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Eric Johnson [R] |
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #110 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2008-12-30 | Senate Prefile |