GA SB147 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to permit student transfers between local school systems without contracts between the local school system where the student resides and the local school system where the student seeks to enroll; to require the State Board of Education to provide for procedures for such student transfers; to provide for caps on tuition that can be charged to a student by an enrolling local unit of administration that exclusively provides virtual instruction to such student; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Boundless Opportunities for Georgia Students Act"; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Shawn Still [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] |
Sen. Clint Dixon [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Billy Hickman [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #562 (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |