GA SB145 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Insisted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Insisted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, so as to prohibit local regulations that create differing standards for or distinguish gasoline-powered leaf blowers from similar equipment; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Landscape Equipment and Agricultural Fairness (LEAF) Act"; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #311 (Y: 103 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #86 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #86 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Insisted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-20 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |