GA SB145 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-5-7.4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to bona fide conservation use property, so as to add farm weddings to the definition of agritourism; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Agritourism; add farm weddings to the definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #406 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Vote #384 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #112 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Vote #384 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #112 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 217 | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2013-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |