GA SB144 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for housing authorities, so as to limit the ability of city housing authorities to operate outside municipal boundaries without authorization; to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Housing Authorities; ability of city housing authorities to operate outside municipal boundaries without authorization; limit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #397 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #333 (Y: 145 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #171 (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #333 (Y: 145 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #171 (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 211 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-23 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |