GA SB144 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 4 of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 46 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the emergency telephone number "9-1-1" system, so as to create the Georgia Emergency 9-1-1 Support Authority as a body corporate and politic, an instrumentality of the state, and a public corporation; to amend Code Section 38-3-20, relating to the creation of the Georgia Emergency Management Agency, director, and director's duties, so as to conform cross-references; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Emergency 9-1-1 Support Authority; create
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |