GA SB139 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to selling and other trade practices, so as to provide that any regulation regarding the use, disposition, or sale or any imposition of any prohibition, restriction, fee imposition, or taxation of auxiliary containers shall be done only by general law; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Selling and Other Trade Practices; provide regulation; auxiliary containers shall be done by general law
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #327 (Y: 67 N: 85 NV: 14 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #56 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #57 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #56 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #57 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |