GA SB138 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Sections 15-16-8 and 45-5-6 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to how vacancies filled, failure to appoint, and certification required and public official investigated by special commission upon indictment, gubernatorial review if commission recommends suspension, suspension, reinstatement, and replacement or temporary officer, respectively, so as to revise the procedure for filling vacancies in the office of sheriff; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Sheriff; procedure for filling vacancies; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #819 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #172 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-03-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-03-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-07HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-06SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-06SenateSenate Third Read
2023-03-06SenateSenate Taken from Table
2023-03-06SenateSenate Tabled
2023-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-02-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-09SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback