GA SB134 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 24 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to evidence, so as to provide that a child witness be deemed competent to testify without taking the oath; to allow the use of narrative form medical reports in dependency and termination matters; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Evidence; that a child witness be deemed competent to testify without taking the oath; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #240 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #107 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #107 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-02 | Act 247 | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |