GA SB134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 12 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Commission on the Holocaust, so as to reassign the commission for administrative purposes; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Commission on the Holocaust; commission for administrative purposes; reassign
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - House - House Vote #644 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #468 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #468 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 579 | |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |