GA SB134 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 14 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to speed detection devices, so as to provide for a rebuttable presumption for law enforcement agencies' use of speed detection devices when fines are less than a certain percent of the agencies' operating budgets; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Speed Detection Devices; provide for a rebuttable presumption for law enforcement agencies' use of speed detection devices
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Curt Thompson [D] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #387 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #335 (Y: 91 N: 58 NV: 12 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #336 (Y: 76 N: 75 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #337 (Y: 104 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #102 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #335 (Y: 91 N: 58 NV: 12 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #336 (Y: 76 N: 75 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #337 (Y: 104 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #102 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 180 | |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Res By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House Reconsidered |
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |