GA SB134 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 29, Chapter 9 of Title 34, and Chapter 12 of Title 53 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to guardian and ward, workers' compensation, and trusts, respectively, so as make technical corrections, correct terminology, and update cross-references reflecting the enactment of the guardianship and trust codes in recent legislative sessions; to allow natural guardians of children to consent on behalf of a beneficiary if there is no conflict of interest; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Guardianship, Workers Compensation, Trusts; make technical corrections, correct terminology and update cross-references reflecting the enactment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House Vote #248 - Passage (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #68 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #68 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-12 | Act 181 | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-30 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-07 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-04 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Read and Referred |