GA SB131 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for the Juvenile Code, so as to provide that adoption proceedings be stayed while an appeal of an order to terminate parental rights is pending; to clarify the court's duties to a case while an appeal is pending; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Code; adoption proceedings be stayed while an appeal to terminate parental rights is pending; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #784 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #670 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #409 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-31HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-30SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-01-30SenateSenate Third Read
2018-01-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-17SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-07SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback