GA SB13 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Conference Committee Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Conference Committee Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Sections 9-13-161, 44-14-162, and 48-4-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to where and when sales under execution held and change of place of public sales by court order, sales made on foreclosure under power of sale, and procedures for sales under tax levies and executions, respectively, so as to authorize online public sales under tax levies and executions; to provide a time frame for sales of real estate under foreclosure powers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Sales; tax levies and executions; authorize online
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] |
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Russ Goodman [R] | Sen. Billy Hickman [R] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - Adopt Ccr: House Vote #389 (Y: 152 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute As Amended: Senate Vote #351 (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #317 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #60 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute As Amended: Senate Vote #351 (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #317 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #60 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-03-29 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 18th, 49th |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 56th, 17th, 19th |
2023-03-29 | House | House Insisted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2023-03-29 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |