GA SB13 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-12 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-12 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 26 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to nurses, so as to require mandatory reporting for nurses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nurses; require mandatory reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Earl Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #130 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Senate Prefile |