GA SB128 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration and licensing of motor vehicles, and so as to provide for the issuances, at the option of the owner, of permanent license plates for boat trailers, utility trailers, and noncommercial cattle and livestock trailers; to provide for fees; to provide that such license plates shall not be transferable; to provide for administration; to provide for an effective date and for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicles; option of owner; permanent license plates for boat, utility, noncommercial cattle/livestock trailers; provide for fees
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Ralph Hudgens [R] | Sen. Dan Moody [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Eugene Pearson [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #424 - Agree To House Amendment (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #417 - Pass (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #416 - Burns Am 36 0175 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #415 - Sims 169 Am (Y: 11 N: 154 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2009-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #123 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #417 - Pass (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #416 - Burns Am 36 0175 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #415 - Sims 169 Am (Y: 11 N: 154 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2009-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #123 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-01 | Act 101 | |
2009-05-01 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2009-04-01 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-10 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-09 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-10 | Senate Read and Referred |