GA SB120 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 28 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fiscal bills generally, so as to require an economic analysis to be conducted by the state auditor of certain income tax credits and exemptions from sales and use taxes according to a schedule; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Georgia Tax Credit Business Case Act"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #395 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #351 (Y: 150 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #88 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Veto V12
2019-05-10SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-09SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-03-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-04HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-01SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-01SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-02-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-19SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-15SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback