GA SB116 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to children and youth services, so as to provide for registration of maternity supportive housing residences to provide housing for pregnant women; to define a term; to provide for requirements; to prohibit additional rules and regulations; to prohibit constraints imposed by local governments; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for related matters; to provide a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Children and Youth Services; registration of maternity supportive house residences to provide housing for pregnant women; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] |
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #827 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #827 (Y: 103 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #91 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #827 (Y: 103 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #91 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 787 | |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-04-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |