GA SB116 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to establish Celebrate Freedom Week; to provide for the posting of historical documents; to require the Department of Education to develop online resources and instructional support; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrate Freedom Week; establish; posting of historical documents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #117 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2015-03-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2015-03-18HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-03-13HouseHouse First Readers
2015-03-11SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2015-03-11SenateSenate Third Read
2015-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2015-03-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2015-02-12SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback