GA SB113 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to create a new class of motor vehicles to be known as autonomous vehicles; to provide for definitions; to provide for requirements to operate an autonomous vehicle; to provide for the operation of autonomous vehicles on public highways for testing purposes; to provide for indemnity to vehicle manufacturers in certain instances; to provide for the regulation of autonomous vehicles; to provide for a penalty; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicles and Traffic; create new class or motor vehicles to be known as autonomous vehicles; definitions; requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |