GA SB110 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 12-8-25.3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to further restrictions on municipal solid waste landfill sites within significant ground-water recharge areas or near military air space used as a bombing range and untreated municipal sewage sludge, so as to repeal certain provisions relating to restrictions on municipal solid waste landfill sites within significant ground-water recharge areas; to eliminate a reference to such provisions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Waste Management; restrictions on municipal solid waste landfill sites within significant ground-water recharge areas; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. John Bulloch [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #726 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #94 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #94 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-29 | House Insists | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2012-03-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-11 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-10 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Read and Referred |