GA SB11 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 42-9-45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the general rule-making power of the State Board of Pardons and Paroles, so as to provide that the State Board of Pardons and Paroles shall issue a certificate of restoration of voting rights to each person convicted of a felony involving moral turpitude within 30 days following the completion of such person's sentence; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pardons and Paroles; general rule making power; certificate of restoration of voting rights; person convicted of felony
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2008-12-11 | Senate Prefile |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/25903 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/sb11_As_introduced_LC_28_4373_2.htm |