GA SB109 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 38 of the O.C.G.A., relating to emergency management, so as to provide for the enactment of the "Recognition of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact" ("REPLICA"); to establish the Interstate Commission for EMS Personnel Practice; to provide for a coordinated database; to provide for rulemaking; to provide for oversight, dispute resolution, and enforcement; to provide for contingent effectiveness of the compact; to provide for construction and severability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Recognition of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact" ("REPLICA"); provide for the enactment
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Williams [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Scott Hilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #305 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Vote #277 (Y: 122 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Vote #278 (Y: 161 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #93 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Vote #277 (Y: 122 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Vote #278 (Y: 161 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #93 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 175 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2017-03-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |