GA SB105 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 10 of Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to procedure for sentencing and imposition of punishment, and Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state-wide probation system, so as to revise the conditions and procedures under which probation may be terminated early; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-Wide Probation System; conditions and procedures under which probation may be terminated early; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #321 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #78 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03 Effective Date 2021-05-03
2021-05-03 Act 151
2021-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2021-03-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-18HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-25SenateSenate Third Read
2021-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-08SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback