GA SB1 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Act 254
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Act 254
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding state government, so as to remove the automatic repealer on the prohibition on state and local governments from requiring proof of COVID vaccination for government services; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Government; automatic repealer on the prohibition on state and local governments from requiring proof of COVID vaccination for government services; remove
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #280 (Y: 99 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #24 (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #24 (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Act 254 | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-21 | House | House Postponed |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |