GA SB1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for a penalty for hit and run accidents that result in serious injury; to clarify a cross-reference relating to suspensions of drivers' licenses; to provide a definition; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"C.J.'s Law"; penalty for hit and run accidents that result in serious injury; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Jennifer Jordan [D] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Rep. William Boddie [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #272 (Y: 131 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #43 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #43 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-03 | Act 151 | |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Senate Prefiled |