GA SB1 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to crimes and offenses, so as to revise the definition of domestic terrorism to more inclusively capture situational violations commonly used by persons who desire to commit acts of terror; to revise the offenses of a terroristic threat and a terroristic act; to amend Article 9 of Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Information Sharing and Analysis Center, so as to revise the definition of homeland security activity to enable the center's work in the state's effective prevention or discovery of, response to, and recovery from domestic terrorism; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"The Protect Act- Protecting Georgians Against Terrorism"; revise the definition of domestic terrorism

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #121 (Y: 42 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-03HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-11SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-10SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback