GA SB1 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-24-59.10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance coverage for autism, so as to provide for certain insurance coverage of autism spectrum disorders; to provide for definitions; to provide for limitations; to provide for premium cap and other conditions; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; provide for certain insurance coverage for autism spectrum disorders
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] |
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #800 (Y: 150 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #12 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #12 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |